Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pelliccia, Richard, Ramirez, Monica, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Garner, Margaret, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Jairam, Nishall N, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Richard Pelliccia and Monica Ramirez against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company for breach of contract, declaratory relief, and a demand for a jury trial. The plaintiffs state that they had a policy of insuranc...
Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 02, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 09, 2018Opposition
Date: May 03, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: May 04, 2018Opposition
Date: May 07, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 09, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: July 17, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: June 08, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: June 08, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 25, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 26, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: July 25, 2018Opposition
Date: August 03, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 14, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 29, 2018Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: February 15, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 16, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 02, 2018Response to Motion
Date: March 09, 2018Response to Motion
Date: February 22, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 20, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 09, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Plaintiff Ramirez, Monica Plaintiff Pelliccia, Richard |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Plaintiff Pelliccia, Richard Plaintiff Ramirez, Monica |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S PLEADINGS FOR FRAUD UPON THE COURTParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NMBERS 1, 2, 3 & 5 AND PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION NUMBERS 5&6Party: Plaintiff Pelliccia, Richard Plaintiff Ramirez, Monica |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NMBERS 1, 2, 3 & 5 AND PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION NUMBERS 5&6Party: Plaintiff Ramirez, Monica Plaintiff Pelliccia, Richard |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.