Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apartments, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Tulloch, Ashley Robyn, against Steinberg, Estelle, represented by Watson, John Adair, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2014 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apartments Phase 3, Inc. 3, a Florida not-for-profit corporation, against Estelle Steinberg and an unknown tenant. The plaintiff is a condominium association responsible for ad...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 23, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: April 03, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: December 10, 2014eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 05, 2018Directions to the Clerk
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: February 22, 2018Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: March 05, 2018Order
Date: March 07, 2018Answer of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: March 19, 2018Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: June 11, 2018Affidavit of Time Expended
Date: June 11, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: June 20, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: July 11, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: July 11, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: July 30, 2018Motion for Default Jgmt
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: October 16, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: November 02, 2018Motion to Reset Sale Date
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2018Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: December 10, 2018Order Denying
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: December 11, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: December 28, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: January 16, 2019Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: March 18, 2019Certificate of Disbursements
Date: January 29, 2019Certificate of Title
Date: January 29, 2019Bid Sheet
Date: January 16, 2019Certificate of Title
Date: April 19, 2019Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: March 25, 2019Motion
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 14, 2020Motion
Date: December 14, 2020Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: February 03, 2021Affidavit
Date: December 15, 2020Order Disbursing Funds
Date: December 10, 2014Motion
Date: November 02, 2018Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Action
Date: February 28, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter sent Re: Unclaimed Property per FS 717.117(4) | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF OWNER'S CLAIM FOR FORECLOSURE SURPLUSParty: Defendant Steinberg, Estelle |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Wednesday January 06,2021 8:45 AM |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion TO AWARD SURPLUS OF FORECLOSURE SALEParty: Defendant Steinberg, Estelle |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion TO AWARD SURPLUS OF FORECLOSURE SALE |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing August 12, 2019 8:45 am room 14175 |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Title (RECORDED COPY FROM BROWARD COUNTY) |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.