Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Donald Merlin Marks Revocable Trust, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Draper, Chris Alan, against Whittelsey, Mari, Whittelsey, Thomas, represented by Rosen, Eric A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Agreed Order
Date: January 28, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 08, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 14, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 29, 2018Response
Date: August 20, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 05, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: June 17, 2018Request to Produce
Date: May 03, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 01, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: September 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel 20 DAYS |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPELParty: Defendant Whittelsey, Mari |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS AND TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENANT, MARI WHITTELSEYParty: Plaintiff Donald Merlin Marks Revocable Trust |
|
June 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Donald Merlin Marks Revocable Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.