Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Leblanc, Jean Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Julmiste, Wilner J, against A And A West Indian Groceries Inc, Assim, Mohamed Azad, Ortega, Jose Carlos Benitz, represented by Giaramita, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Jean Robert LeBlanc against A & A West Indian Groceries Inc., Jose Carlos Benitz Ortega, and Mohamed Azad Assim. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants in a motor vehicle accident that occurred in Br...
Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 28, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 07, 2018Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 23, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 07, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 02, 2019Answer to Interrogs
Date: January 31, 2019Order Resetting
Date: February 21, 2019Notice of Intent
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 08, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: April 17, 2019Order
Date: March 08, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 12, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: October 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 04, 2018Notice of Supplemental Interrogs
Date: August 30, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: October 29, 2018Notice
Date: October 29, 2018Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 25, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 26, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: January 21, 2019Witness List
Date: January 24, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 18, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: October 04, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 29, 2019Witness List
Date: January 25, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 25, 2018Exhibit List
Date: February 01, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 16, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 06, 2019Motion
Date: April 03, 2019Request
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 05, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 08, 2019Response to Notice to Produce
Date: April 12, 2019Witness List
Date: March 08, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: September 25, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 23, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: February 01, 2019Consent
Date: January 21, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 29, 2019Order Resetting
Date: October 21, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 30, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 12, 2018Response to Motion
Date: October 03, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 17, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 12, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: April 12, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 01, 2019Comment:
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 05, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: August 30, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: March 26, 2019Objection
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: February 14, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: February 14, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 18, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: January 21, 2019Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: October 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: September 14, 2018Exhibit List
Date: February 08, 2019Request for Copies
Date: March 07, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 20, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: January 11, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: June 21, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: February 12, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: July 31, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 29, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 26, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 05, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 12, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 09, 2018Notice for/of Trial
Date: March 29, 2018Subpoena Filed
Date: April 26, 2018Disclosure
Date: February 12, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: June 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: July 19, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 20, 2018Notice of Service
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 27, 2018Objection
Date: February 13, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: October 17, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: September 14, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: February 12, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 05, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: June 21, 2018Request for Copies
Date: January 30, 2019Mediation Report
Date: September 11, 2018Request for Production
Date: December 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 05, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 04, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 12, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: February 08, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 12, 2019Request for Examination
Date: April 05, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 29, 2018Request for Copies
Date: April 06, 2018Exhibit List
Date: February 13, 2019Disclosure
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: September 14, 2018Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: August 06, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: July 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 24, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 04, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 05, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: March 28, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 17, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 28, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: April 10, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: August 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 09, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 14, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: November 30, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: November 06, 2018Exhibit List
Date: February 08, 2019Notice of Expert Interrogs
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 11, 2019Order Setting
Date: April 24, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 12, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 16, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: April 10, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 28, 2019Exhibit List
Date: January 25, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 01, 2019Agreed Order
Date: February 25, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 04, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 11, 2019Request for Production
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: September 20, 2018Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: October 17, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Examination
Date: April 05, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 23, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: February 14, 2019Objection
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: February 12, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 12, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2018Witness List
Date: January 25, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: November 28, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: September 25, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: February 13, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 18, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: February 14, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: February 13, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: February 14, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: November 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: January 11, 2019Objection
Date: February 14, 2019Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: October 17, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Party: Plaintiff Leblanc, Jean Robert |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation Party: Plaintiff Leblanc, Jean Robert |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine SECONDParty: Defendant A and A West Indian Groceries Inc |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Notice to Produce | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Interrogatories & Notice of Service | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Expert Interrogs | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request to Produce | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR LEAVE TO ALLOWParty: Plaintiff Leblanc, Jean Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.