Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Guzman, Noralys, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aslan, Berkin, against Mohammed, Ayesha, Tahseen, Nighat Aziz, represented by Mathias, Jerrod E, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Noralys Guzman, is suing the defendants, Ayesha Mohammed (owner) and Nighat Aziz Tahseen (driver), for damages in ex...
Request for Admissions
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 01, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: February 27, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 27, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 27, 2018Request for Copies
Date: March 23, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: June 08, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 08, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: June 21, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 28, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 20, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: December 05, 2018Mediation Report
Date: January 24, 2019Response
Date: December 06, 2018Agreed Order
Date: December 19, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 28, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: February 06, 2019Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: February 21, 2019Order on Motion to Compel
Date: February 07, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: February 25, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: January 31, 2019Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: May 07, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: April 25, 2019Order
Date: August 06, 2019Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: August 08, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: October 30, 2019Notice of Expert Witnesses
Date: October 01, 2019Response
Date: January 27, 2020Response
Date: January 27, 2020Request to Produce
Date: February 27, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 06, 2018Order Resetting
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 28, 2019Request for Production
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: February 27, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: March 11, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: May 07, 2019Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: May 08, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: May 29, 2019Order
Date: June 06, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 16, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: July 26, 2019Ex Parte Motion
Date: August 05, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 08, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: September 24, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: September 25, 2019Ex Parte Motion
Date: October 21, 2019Request for Production
Date: December 18, 2019Order Revalidating Subpoenas
Date: January 16, 2020Order Revalidating Subpoenas
Date: February 07, 2020Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: May 13, 2020Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: March 04, 2020Request for Production
Date: May 13, 2020Response
Date: June 19, 2020Response
Date: June 19, 2020Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: June 24, 2020Ex Parte Motion
Date: June 24, 2020Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 29, 2020Response
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 02, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: June 24, 2020Request to Produce
Date: December 18, 2019Request for Production
Date: July 02, 2020Ex Parte Motion
Date: January 15, 2020Request for Production
Date: July 16, 2019Ex Parte Motion
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 03, 2019Expert Interrogatories
Date: May 13, 2020Ex Parte Motion
Date: February 07, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: October 23, 2019Request to Produce
Date: May 13, 2020Expert Interrogatories
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial 02-04-2021 10:00 AM |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Disclosure of Expert Witness Party: Defendant Mohammed, Ayesha Defendant Tahseen, Nighat Aziz |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response AMENDED TO UPDATED TRIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Tahseen, Nighat Aziz |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Exhibits UPDATED LISTParty: Defendant Mohammed, Ayesha Defendant Tahseen, Nighat Aziz |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order to Compel | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPELParty: Defendant Mohammed, Ayesha |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANTS, AYESHA MOHAMMED AND NIGHAT AZIZ TAHSEEN, TO PROVIDE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS UPDATED TRIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Plaintiff Guzman, Noralys |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response TO UPDATED TRIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Tahseen, Nighat Aziz |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.