Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Corprew, Adrienne, Philpart, Thomas, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Quincel, Tracey Renee, against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Sperber, M.Andrew, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Adrienne Corprew (now known as Adrienne Corprew Philpart) and Thomas Philpart, against the defendant, Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 13, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 17, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Corprew, Adrienne Plaintiff Philpart, Thomas |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO PLAINTIFFSParty: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.