Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Eddy, Gerald, Eddy, Michelle, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Wites, Marc A, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 23, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 15, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 12, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 25, 2018Agreed Order
Date: June 15, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: May 15, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: September 25, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 15, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 15, 2019Mediation Report
Date: September 26, 2019Witness List
Date: June 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 03, 2020Joint Stipulation
Date: March 09, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 28, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: March 01, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 11, 2018Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: September 28, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 11, 2018Objection
Date: May 15, 2019Motion
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR DISMISSALParty: Plaintiff Eddy, Gerald Plaintiff Eddy, Michelle Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Party: Plaintiff Eddy, Gerald Plaintiff Eddy, Michelle |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDAR CALL: 10-17-2019 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.