Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hylton, Tosha, Hylton, Vincent, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Morgan, Thomas J, Jr., against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Robinson, Chrystal P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Vincent Hylton against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The plaintiff is seeking an amount in excess of $15,000, exclusive of attorney fees, costs, and interest. Vincent Hylton is a resident of Broward County, Flori...
Amended Complaint
Date: March 19, 2018Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 05, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 24, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 01, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: THOMAS J MORGAN JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012598; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: THOMAS J MORGAN JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002604; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: THOMAS J MORGAN JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002604; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.