Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Espinal Galeas, Alma Lizeth, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Morgan, Thomas J, Jr., against Anchor Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Elsasser, Krista L, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Alma Lizeth Espinal Galeas against Anchor Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking an amount exceeding $15,000, exclusive of attorney's fees, costs, and interest. The plaintiff is a resident of Browar...
Request to Produce
Date: January 05, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 08, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 14, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 04, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Interrogatories
Date: February 01, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 12, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 21, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 28, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 15, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 13, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 03, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 05, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 10, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 21, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: May 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Espinal Galeas, Alma Lizeth |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.