Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aris, Kenol, Ortheus, Magalie, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Benmeleh, Jack, Esq., against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Gonzalez, Aileen N, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Magalie Ortheus and Kenol Aris against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowner's insurance policy with the defendant, which provided coverage for their property located at 1598 S...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 01, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 11, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: May 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 25, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 12, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 25, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 25, 2018Motion to File
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to File Party: Plaintiff Ortheus, Magalie Plaintiff Aris, Kenol |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Ortheus, Magalie Plaintiff Aris, Kenol |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses to the Plaintiff's ComplaintParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Interrogs Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.