Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jr Mechanical Services Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jeffrey, J Needle, Esq., against North Miami Cleaners Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by JR MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC, a Florida Corporation, against NORTH MIAMI CLEANERS, INC d/b/a SPOTMASTER LINENS. The plaintiff is seeking money damages in the amount of $59,709.54, exclusive of pre-judgment interest, costs, a...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 08, 2018Settlement Agreement
Date: April 03, 2018Mediation Report
Date: April 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: February 28, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: February 28, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: March 23, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: April 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement AT MEDIATIONParty: Plaintiff Jr Mechanical Services Inc |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Jr Mechanical Services Inc |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGESParty: Defendant North Miami Cleaners Inc | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order FOR MANDATORY MEDIATION |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant North Miami Cleaners Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.