Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Collins, Darryle, Fulton, Donte, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Israel, Matthew E, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Groelle, Robert C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, Donte Fulton and Darryle Collins, against the Defendant, Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The Plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and co...
Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 14, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served
Date: January 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 14, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 02, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 13, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel Defendant |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel ROBERT C. GROELEE FBN. 829323Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AMENDEDParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, or in the alternative, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND OTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COUNT IParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance /AMENDEDParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served Tuesday, January 9, 2018Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs to Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Fulton, Donte Plaintiff Collins, Darryle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.