Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Badin, Carlos, Badin, Juliana, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Glassman, Lee D, Esq., against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company, represented by Frank, Scott J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Carlos Badin and Juliana Badin against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are residents of Miami, Florida, and the defendant is an insurance company conducting business in Broward County, Florida. The plai...
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Prod of Documents
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Service
Date: May 17, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 18, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: July 19, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: July 17, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 27, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 22, 2018Order
Date: September 10, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: September 21, 2018Request for Copies
Date: September 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 21, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 26, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: November 29, 2018Certificate
Date: December 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 31, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 01, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 01, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 05, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 13, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 14, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 15, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 17, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 17, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 21, 2018Motion
Date: August 27, 2018Motion
Date: August 27, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: September 21, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 03, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 28, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 29, 2018Mediation Report
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 13, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: February 01, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 21, 2018Response to Motion
Date: February 19, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 14, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: October 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY FOR COURT-ORDERED MEDIATIONParty: Defendant Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation 12/12/18 3:30 PM |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITHOUT HEARINGParty: Plaintiff Badin, Carlos Plaintiff Badin, Juliana |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.