Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Herrera, John Freddy, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Morgan Jr, Thomas J, Esq., against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by John Freddy Herrera against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that the insured, John Freddy Herrera, had a homeowners insurance policy with the Insurance Company. The insured's property ...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 04, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 23, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: November 15, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 31, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 31, 2018Notice
Date: June 27, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 02, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 27, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 05, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 02, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 02, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 31, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 22, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 27, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES /GRANTED IN PART |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Herrera, John Freddy |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Herrera, John Freddy |
|
September 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
September 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.