Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Applewood Village Ii Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Procton, Lloyd W, against Camacho, Erika, Romero, Jr., Wilson, Romero, Vanessa Delgado, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Applewood Village II Condominium Association, Inc. against defendants Erika Camacho, Unknown Spouse of Erika Camacho, Vanessa Delgado Romero, Willson Romero Jr., and Unknown Tenant. The complaint is divided into three count...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 11, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 11, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 11, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 31, 2018Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count(s)
Date: March 30, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 31, 2018Motion for Entry
Date: April 27, 2018Motion for Entry
Date: April 27, 2018Motion
Date: April 27, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 10, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 02-19-2021at 10:00 am rm 16155 or Zoom |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry OF COURT'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT WILLSON ROMERO JR. as to COUNT III OF THE COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Applewood Village II Condominium Association Inc |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry OF COURT'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT VANESSA DELGADO ROMERO as to COUNT III OF THE COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Applewood Village II Condominium Association Inc |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion OF COURT'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ERIKA CAMACHO as to COUNT III OF THE COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Applewood Village II Condominium Association Inc |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count(s) COUNT I, COUNT II of the COMPLAINT- ONLY, COUNT III REMAINS PENDINGParty: Plaintiff Applewood Village II Condominium Association Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.