Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Behar Gutt & Glazer Pa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gladding, Stacey, against Gamesboutike Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by BEHAR, GUTT & GLAZER, P.A. against GAMESBOUTIKE, INC. The complaint alleges that the defendant entered into an agreement with the plaintiff to provide legal services in exchange for payment. The plaintiff claims that the de...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 25, 2019Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 25, 2019Showing of Good Cause
Date: January 25, 2019eSummons Issuance - Pluries
Date: November 06, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: January 31, 2019Order on Showing of Good Cause
Date: January 31, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: September 17, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: November 20, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: November 06, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 25, 2019eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: April 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 02-19-2021at 10:00 am rm 16170 or Zoom |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Pluries To Gamesboutike Inc |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved on Gamesboutike Inc |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: IRA GUTT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A050189; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias Party: Defendant Gamesboutike Inc |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Showing of Good Cause | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Behar Gutt & Glazer PA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.