Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Paul, Evince, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dieppa, Raymond R, against Emery, Ross, Tyco Integrated Security Llc, represented by Mcloone, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Evince Paul against defendants Ross Emery and Tyco Integrated Security, LLC. The complaint alleges that on July 5, 2016, Tyco Integrated Security, LLC allowed the subject motor vehicle, a 2012 Ford Van, to be negligently op...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 01, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 10, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 10, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: January 19, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Tyco Integrated Security LLC Defendant Emery, Ross |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Tyco Integrated Security LLC Defendant Emery, Ross |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served 17th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Emery, Ross |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served Summons- 1/12/2018Party: Defendant Tyco Integrated Security LLC |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance TYCO INTEGRATED SECURITY, LLC |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ROSS EMERY |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RAYMOND R DIEPPA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A004778; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Paul, Evince |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RAYMOND R DIEPPA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002378; ;Amount: $401.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.