Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Republic Square Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pearl, Andrea L, Esq., against Bachkoeva, Larisa, represented by Goldberg, K Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Republic Square Condominium Association, Inc. against Larisa Bachkoeva, Unknown Spouse of Larisa Bachkoeva, and John Doe as Tenant in Possession and all other tenants. The complaint is for foreclosure and damages. The plain...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice
Date: April 11, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 16, 2018Letter/Answer
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 10, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: May 14, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Agreed Order
Date: June 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order to Reassign Case |
|
June 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE SERVICE LISTParty: Defendant Bachkoeva, Larisa |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO REASSIGN CASEParty: Plaintiff Republic Square Condominium Association Inc |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESParty: Plaintiff Republic Square Condominium Association Inc |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel ROBERT A. BOUVATTE, JR. Florida Bar No. 71525 |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer Anna Fritzsche EsqParty: Defendant Bachkoeva, Larisa |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ALAN SCHWARTZSEID ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003768; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: LARISA BACHKOEVA |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARISA BACHKOEVA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.