Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Solorzano , Jorge, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Urbano, Dennis Nicholas, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Seibert, Troy Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Jorge Solorzano against American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida. The complaint alleges breach of an insurance contract and demands damages in excess of $15,000. The insured, Jorge Solorzano, is a resident of Broward...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 26, 2018Request to Produce
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 16, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 13, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Jury Trial
Date: November 07, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 28, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 05, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 26, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial TO SET CAUSEParty: Plaintiff Solorzano , Jorge |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Solorzano , Jorge |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Solorzano , Jorge |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Motion to Compel | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S COMPLETE AND VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND COMPLETE RESPONSES AND REPONSIVE DOCUMENTS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Mr. Jorge Solorzano |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.