Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mckee, Nicole D, against Chejin, Saulo Moises, Parkland Golf & Country Club Foundation Inc, Romero, Blanca Z, represented by Corona, Ricardo R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by US Bank National Association as Trustee for Angel Oak Mortgage Trust I, LLC, 2016-1, Mortgage-Backed Certificates, Series 2016-1 against Saulo Moises Chejin, Blanca Z. Romero, and Parkland Golf & Countr...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 05, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 30, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: February 28, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 11, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 27, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: June 01, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 11, 2018Order Setting
Date: June 25, 2018Order Setting
Date: June 25, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: July 03, 2018Order Setting
Date: December 04, 2018Order Setting
Date: April 30, 2019Order Setting
Date: August 21, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: August 26, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Service
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: April 22, 2020Notice of Service
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 21, 2020Notice
Date: July 16, 2020Order Setting
Date: March 25, 2021Order Setting
Date: June 08, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: February 18, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: November 11, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: February 24, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 31, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: May 24, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 03, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 16, 2021Amended Witness List
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 01, 2021Order
Date: October 06, 2021Notice
Date: October 08, 2021Order Setting
Date: October 06, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Service
Date: December 14, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 28, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: June 01, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 11, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: June 11, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 03, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: July 03, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 11, 2018Amended Witness List
Date: July 13, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 22, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: August 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: August 28, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: September 25, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: September 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 28, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 19, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: November 29, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: November 29, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 30, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: December 18, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: December 18, 2018Order Setting
Date: April 30, 2019Motion for Leave to File
Date: January 03, 2020Amended Witness List
Date: June 21, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: October 30, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 04, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: December 02, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 03, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: January 03, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 12, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: March 02, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2020Certificate of Service
Date: March 04, 2020Request for Production
Date: March 23, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 23, 2020Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 26, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: March 27, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: April 20, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: April 20, 2020Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: April 21, 2020Notice
Date: April 22, 2020Order Denying Motion
Date: June 03, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 09, 2020Notice of Service
Date: June 10, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 02, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Service
Date: September 01, 2020Order Setting
Date: November 02, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Service
Date: November 03, 2020Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act
Date: March 01, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: March 23, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: June 01, 2021Notice
Date: June 11, 2021Notice
Date: July 06, 2021Joint Motion to Continue
Date: September 30, 2021Motion
Date: November 24, 2021Agreed Order Granting
Date: December 09, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 24, 2021Order Granting Motion
Date: December 10, 2021Order Setting
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Service
Date: March 31, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: May 21, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: March 04, 2021Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: April 21, 2020Amended Witness List
Date: January 25, 2019Notice
Date: August 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Return Original Note and Mortgage |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff US Bank National Association |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss AND RELEASE LIS PENDENSParty: Plaintiff US Bank National Association |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVING PLEADINGSParty: Plaintiff US Bank National Association |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.