Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan, against Charles Schwab Bank Na, English, James Matthew, Kings Point In Tamarac Inc, Weldon Condominium F Association Inc, Weldon Neighborhood Association Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Frank, Neil G, Lubliner, Richard S, Valancy, Steven S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint for foreclosure of a mortgage filed by Citimortgage, Inc. against the unknown heirs, beneficiaries, devisees, grantees, assignees, lienors, creditors, trustees, and all others who may claim an interest in the es...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 05, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: February 02, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 05, 2018Certificate
Date: January 05, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 12, 2018Answer
Date: January 15, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Answer
Date: January 15, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 13, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 20, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: March 13, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Action
Date: March 20, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: May 09, 2018Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: July 17, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: July 23, 2018Reply
Date: July 30, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: August 01, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: August 17, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: July 31, 2018Motion for Default
Date: August 01, 2018Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: August 10, 2018Reply
Date: August 13, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 20, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: August 24, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: October 11, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: October 11, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: October 31, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: November 29, 2018Motion
Date: December 10, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: November 01, 2018Assignment of Bid
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: December 13, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: December 18, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: December 12, 2018Motion for Disbursement
Date: December 19, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: December 24, 2018Certificate of Disbursements
Date: December 27, 2018Certificate of Disbursements
Date: January 25, 2019Cross Notice
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 06, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: February 12, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: February 19, 2019Order Disbursing Funds
Date: March 01, 2019Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: March 13, 2019Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: May 30, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 02, 2018Motion for Leave to File
Date: June 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 22, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 17, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 17, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: July 26, 2018Notice of Intent
Date: July 30, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: July 31, 2018Default
Date: August 01, 2018Order Setting
Date: August 14, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: August 14, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 20, 2018Waiver
Date: October 11, 2018Report of General Magistrate
Date: October 11, 2018Order Approving Assignment of Bid
Date: December 17, 2018Certificate of Title
Date: December 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 18, 2019Motion
Date: January 15, 2019Certificate of Disbursements
Date: January 17, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: February 06, 2019Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: March 28, 2019Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: March 29, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: April 01, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: November 15, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: December 12, 2018Motion for Disbursement
Date: December 27, 2018Supplemental
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO CHARLES SCHWAB BANK NA / PER ORD / $16,890.09 / MAILED |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Voided Check #100222 to Charles Schwab Bank Na / $16,890.09 |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO KINGS POINT IN TAMARAC INC PER ORD ($2,872.04) MAILED TO ATTY; STEVEN S VALANCY PA TRUST ACCOUNT $610,00) MAILED; CHARLES SCHWAB BANK NA PER ORD ($16,890.09) MAILED TO ATTY; BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK $45.00) SERVICE CHAGES |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.