Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Republic Square Condo Assoc Inc. Plaintiff vs. Gary Heimowitz Defendant
On January 05, 2018 a real prop other - $0 - $50,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Real Prop Other - $0 - $50,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Republic Square Condominium Association, Inc. against defendants Gary Heimowitz, Unknown Spouse of Gary Heimowitz, and John Doe as Tenant in Possession and all other tenants. The complaint is for foreclosure and damages…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order of Reassignment
Date: May 02, 2018Notice
Date: Apr 10, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Feb 27, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Feb 27, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Feb 16, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 07, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 02, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Feb 02, 2018Motion to Reassign
Date: Jan 16, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: Jan 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 05, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: Jan 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Reassignment Agreed Order on Pl's Mot to Reassign Case/Granted. Clerk is directed to reassign this Condo Lien Forclosure Action to appropriate Circuit Civil Div |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Change of Lead CounselParty: Plaintiff Republic Square Condo Assoc Inc. |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint FOR FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGESParty: Defendant Heimowitz, Gary |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel ROBERT A. BOUVATTE, Jr\. FL BAR No. 71525Party: Plaintiff Republic Square Condo Assoc Inc. |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing FEBRUARY 12 2018 @ 01:30PM RM14160 |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGE'S DEFAULT |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reassign Party: Plaintiff Republic Square Condo Assoc Inc. |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: JOHN DOE, as tenant in possession, and all other tenants |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GARY HEIMOWITZ |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: GARY HEIMOWITZ |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ALAN SCHWARTZSEID ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002969; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ALAN SCHWARTZSEID ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002969; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Republic Square Condo Assoc Inc. |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: ALAN SCHWARTZSEID ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002328; ;Amount: $401.00 |