Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Government Employees Insurance Company, Herrera, Joshua R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schiller, Bruce H, against Hitch, Matthew R, represented by Fleysher, Emil, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by GEICO Indemnity Company, acting as the subrogee of Joshua Ryan Herrera, against Matthew Raymond Hitch. The complaint alleges that on or about February 1, 2017, Hitch negligently operated his 2016 Dodge Ram and collided with...
Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Return of Service Served
Date: May 02, 2018Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment
Date: November 19, 2018Affidavit of Interest
Date: November 19, 2018Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 19, 2019Motion to Vacate Default
Date: May 16, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Return of Service Served
Date: April 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: June 15, 2018Affidavit
Date: November 26, 2018Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: December 07, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 13, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 15, 2018Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: May 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Default FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment Party: Defendant Hitch, Matthew R |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel Bruce H. Schiller, Esq., FBN 982725Party: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel JOINT MOTIONParty: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Case # 18-19076Party: Defendant Hitch, Matthew R |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company Plaintiff Herrera, Joshua R | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Interest AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDGMENT INTERESTParty: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company Plaintiff Herrera, Joshua R |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default against the Defendant, MATTHEW RAYMOND HITCHParty: Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company Plaintiff Herrera, Joshua R |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.