Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Branigan, Amy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Susen, Marcus J., Esq., against Standard Fire Insurance Company, represented by Schneider, Terry M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint was filed by Amy Branigan against The Standard Fire Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 174th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and ...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Request to Produce
Date: February 20, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 17, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 23, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 10, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 02, 2019Request for Production
Date: December 10, 2018Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: December 05, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2019Mediation Report
Date: December 10, 2018Order Setting
Date: October 18, 2018Demand for Judgment
Date: June 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Mediation DECEMBER 10, 2018 @ 10:30 AM |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERParty: Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition of Corp rep with most knowledge |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.