Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Soto, Harbey, Soto, Jackeline C, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Garcia, Rafael F, against Safepoint Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Harbey Soto and Jackeline C. Soto against Safepoint Insurance Company for breach of contract. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, and the defendant is a Florida corporation engaged in selling homeowner'...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: August 27, 2018Request to Produce
Date: October 18, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 07, 2018Motion to Set Aside Default
Date: October 16, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 18, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: October 18, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: November 14, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Default Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Soto, Harbey Plaintiff Soto, Jackeline C |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AgainstParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served on Friday. january 26,2018Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses RAFAEL F. GARCIAParty: Plaintiff Soto, Harbey Plaintiff Soto, Jackeline C |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Soto, Harbey Plaintiff Soto, Jackeline C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.