Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cypress Tree Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Katz, Steven B., Esq., against Marston, Conroy M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Cypress Tree Condominium Association, Inc. against Conroy M. Marston and unknown tenants in possession #1 and #2. The plaintiff is seeking to foreclose a Claim of Lien against a property located in Broward County, Florida. ...
Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 03, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Stipulation for-of Settlement
Date: May 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel Party: Plaintiff Cypress Tree Condominium Association Inc |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for-of Settlement | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Non ComplianceParty: Plaintiff Cypress Tree Condominium Association Inc |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1 and UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2Party: Plaintiff Cypress Tree Condominium Association Inc |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1 |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2 |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/19/18Party: Defendant Marston, Conroy M |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) for ForeclosureParty: Plaintiff Cypress Tree Condominium Association Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.