Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ross, Thomas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Baker, Todd L, against Geico General Insurance Company, Liefer, Brian, represented by Benson, Charles E, Esq., Kirschbaum, Scott David, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Thomas Ross against Brian Liefer and GEICO General Insurance Company. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000. Thomas Ross is a resident of Broward County, Florida, while Brian Liefer is a resident of Texas. Brian ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 18, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: February 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: February 22, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 08, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: July 06, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: July 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 16, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 25, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 27, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 10, 2018Notice
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: November 26, 2018Request for Copies
Date: December 04, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 07, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: January 11, 2019Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: March 01, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 14, 2019Request for Copies
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 04, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2019Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: February 06, 2019Order Granting
Date: February 28, 2019Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: March 24, 2019Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: February 18, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 13, 2019Request for Copies
Date: March 20, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 19, 2019Request for Copies
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: March 29, 2019Objection
Date: April 08, 2019Request for Copies
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 08, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 28, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 29, 2019Response
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 17, 2019Motion to be Excused
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 23, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: May 21, 2019Response
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 05, 2019Request for Copies
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: July 18, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: July 23, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 23, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 25, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Production
Date: July 29, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Production
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 02, 2019Request for Production
Date: August 09, 2019Certification Regarding Attendance at Mediation
Date: August 07, 2019Response to Motion
Date: August 12, 2019Witness List
Date: August 13, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 20, 2019Request for Copies
Date: August 21, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 23, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 11, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 05, 2018Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 18, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 18, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 19, 2018Summons on Insurance Commissioner Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 22, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 06, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 13, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 14, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 16, 2018Acceptance of Service By Secretary of State
Date: April 09, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 19, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 07, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 15, 2018Affidavit
Date: May 15, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Change of Address
Date: May 21, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 26, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 06, 2018Request for Production
Date: July 06, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: July 06, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 23, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 25, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: July 25, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 25, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: August 06, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 10, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 10, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 17, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 24, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 26, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: October 31, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 16, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: November 19, 2018Notice
Date: November 20, 2018Objection
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: December 07, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: December 03, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: November 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 27, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 04, 2019Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 31, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 18, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 15, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 24, 2019Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: April 30, 2019Request for Copies
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 30, 2019Request for Copies
Date: May 30, 2019Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: June 03, 2019Agreed Order
Date: June 04, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 05, 2019Request for Production
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 05, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 12, 2019Witness List
Date: July 15, 2019Witness List
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 02, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: August 14, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: August 15, 2019Request for Production
Date: August 20, 2019Mediation Report
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 26, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 23, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: July 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.