Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Durning, James, filed a(n) Other case represented by Berman, Daniel M, Esq., against Church, Douglas, represented by Castrataro, George W, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a response to a complaint filed by James Durning against Douglas Church. The document consists of numbered paragraphs, with some paragraphs being admitted, denied, or without knowledge and demanding strict proof. The law firm repres...
Summons Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 30, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 04, 2019Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: May 23, 2019Witness List
Date: September 09, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: September 09, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: December 02, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: December 26, 2019Motion to Enforce
Date: February 12, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: February 04, 2020Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: March 09, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Service
Date: May 29, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 14, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: October 08, 2018Mediation Report
Date: November 19, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: November 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 30, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 26, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: December 03, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: December 31, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: January 13, 2020Order Resetting
Date: January 07, 2020Order
Date: February 25, 2020Motion for Entry of Judgment
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 11, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: March 18, 2020Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: May 11, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 26, 2018Order
Date: January 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions Party: Attorney Castrataro, George W, ESQ. |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause WHY DOUGLAS CHURCH SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Judgment FINAL AGAINST DEFENDANT DOUGLAS CHURCHParty: Plaintiff Durning, James |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Rule to Show Cause | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order OR MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES/SANCTIONS/GRANTED DEFENDANT SHALL PAY THE $28,00.00 SETTLEMENT AMOUNT TO THE PLAINTIFF |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce SETTLEMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Durning, James |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Durning, James |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Dr. Harry Cooper |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.