Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Perez, Ileana, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Perez, Alian M, against Heritage Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Long, Ryan Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Ileana Perez against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that Perez had a homeowner's insurance policy with the Insurance Company, and that the property insured under the policy sustained a...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 09, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 09, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 09, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 01, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 26, 2018Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: June 05, 2019Stipulation
Date: April 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions Party: Plaintiff Perez, Ileana |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served January 12, 2018Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Perez, Ileana |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Perez, Ileana |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.