Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John P Carriego, et al Plaintiff vs. Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 02, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Settlement
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by John P. Carriego and Joanne Carriego against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company for breach of contract. The plaintiffs allege that they were residents of Florida and owned a property in Broward County. The …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement
Date: Sep 11, 2018Mediation Report
Date: Sep 07, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Sep 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Aug 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jun 28, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: Jun 27, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Jun 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jun 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jun 20, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: Jun 19, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: May 15, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 14, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 31, 2018Answer to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 31, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 02, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Carriego, John P Plaintiff Carriego, Joanne |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AMENDED AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDER CALL: 01-07-2019 |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Compelling Discovery | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REOUESTS AND WAIVE OBJECTIONS AND PRIVILEGESParty: Plaintiff Carriego, John P Plaintiff Carriego, Joanne |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO 1.310 (b)(6) AND UNIVERSAL PROPERTY'SFIELD ADJUSTERParty: Plaintiff Carriego, John P Plaintiff Carriego, Joanne |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ANDREW P. MCDONALD ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000811; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ANDREW P. MCDONALD ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000811; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Carriego, John P |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Carriego, John P Plaintiff Carriego, Joanne |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Carriego, John P Plaintiff Carriego, Joanne |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Carriego, John P |