Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Blackburn, Mark, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Vogel, David M, against Csi International Inc, Estate Of Paul Geofrey Hammond, represented by Krimsky, Beth-Ann E, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Mark Blackburn against defendants CSI International, Inc. and the Estate of Paul Geoffrey Hammond. The jurisdiction for this action is the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages i...
Motion to Compel
Date: September 04, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 19, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: October 29, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: April 23, 2020Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: March 15, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 25, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 20, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Counterclaim Party: Defendant CSI International Inc |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference Wednesday, May 13,2020 at 2 p.m |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on case management conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.