Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Harborview Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Smith, Jonathan Brian, against Biggs, Robert, Jr., Brown, Cheryl K, Brown, Joe D, Dosenberry, Stacie, Dosenberry, Todd, (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with , Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Harborview Corporation, a Florida corporation, against multiple defendants. The complaint alleges that the defendants have defaulted on their promissory notes and mortgages for timeshare properties loca...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 11, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 11, 2018Sworn Statement
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Action
Date: January 12, 2018Directions to the Clerk
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 28, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Hearing By Judge
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 02, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 11, 2018Affidavit for Service by Publication
Date: January 08, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 12, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 16, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 28, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 23, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 19, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: March 29, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: April 12, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: May 02, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: May 02, 2018Certificate of Title
Date: May 15, 2018Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: June 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE EMAILED & MAILED |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed | |
May 01, 2018 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
April 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: CHRISTINA DELLAQUILA ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20181RA1A001909; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.