Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ocean Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mandel, Daniel S, against Dany Trader Inc, Orchid Grove Assn Inc, Santana De Vizcaino, Asuncion, Vizcaino, Javier, represented by Lee, Andrew S, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Ocean Bank, a Florida banking corporation, against Dany Trader, Inc., Javier Vizcaino, Asuncion Santana de Vizcaino, John Doe or any other person in possession, and Orchid Grove Association, Inc. The pl...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 11, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: January 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 10, 2018Answer
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 09, 2018Foreclosure Form
Date: June 30, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: July 30, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: September 06, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: September 20, 2018Certificate of Title
Date: November 14, 2018Certificate of Disbursements
Date: November 14, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: September 24, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: October 30, 2018Motion for Entry
Date: March 04, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 02, 2018Certificate
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 11, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 21, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: July 30, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Answer
Date: March 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: DAN MANDEL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A033802; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry OF SUMMARY DEFICIENCY JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Ocean Bank |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO MANDEL MANGANELLI & LEIDER PA TRUST ACCOUNT PER CERT ($262,100.00) MAILED |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Clerk's Fee Payor: Tyler Noddin ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20181RA1A004637; ;Amount: $3,939.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.