Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Stephen A Cameron Plaintiff vs. Jamani Binns, et al Defendant
On January 02, 2018 an other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Stephen Cameron against Jamani Binns, Jacqueline S. Hall, and unknown persons and occupants. The complaint is for ejectment and to recover real property located in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 18, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance JACQUELINE S. HALL |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance JAMANI BINNS |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: CRYSTAL MICHELLE HARVEY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003111; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) For EjectmentParty: Plaintiff Cameron, Stephen A |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: CRYSTAL MICHELLE HARVEY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000458; ;Amount: $401.00 |