Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Florida Spinners Inc, Payan, Arianna, Payan, Paula, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Kleppin, Chris, against Weiner, Marilyn, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Discrimination Employment Or Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Florida Spinners, Inc., Arianna Payan, and Paula Payan against Marilyn Weiner. The plaintiffs allege various torts, including conversion, assault, intentional infliction of emotional distress, breach of loyalty, and defamat...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 07, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: February 20, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 09, 2018Exhibits
Date: February 07, 2018Order Resetting
Date: October 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting 4/24/2020 9:00 am room 16-175 |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Weiner, Marilyn |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Weiner, Marilyn |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served Party: Defendant Weiner, Marilyn |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance MARILYN WEINER |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: CHRIS KLEPPIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000444; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Florida Spinners Inc Plaintiff Payan, Arianna Plaintiff Payan, Paula |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.