Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Harrison, Esmond, Harrison, Merilin, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter, Jr., against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Inc, represented by Campbell-Larmond, Taneka T, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Esmond Harrison and Merilin Harrison against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. The defend...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 12, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 22, 2018Agreed Order Granting
Date: March 20, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 05, 2018Motion to Abate
Date: March 20, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: June 25, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 05, 2018Order
Date: July 10, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count(s)
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Jury Trial
Date: July 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 10, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 13, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 11, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 27, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Party: Plaintiff Harrison, Esmond Plaintiff Harrison, Merilin |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Party: Plaintiff Harrison, Merilin Plaintiff Harrison, Esmond |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Inc |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ON MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II AND MOTION TO STYA DISCOVERY |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count(s) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COUNT II. PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, ONLY |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses AMENDED /AMY KOLTNOW FBN:899010Party: Defendant Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Inc |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.