Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express Bank Fsb, American Express National Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mina, Pierre George, Esq., against Flooring And Kitchen Resources Llc, Montano, Abelardo, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by American Express Bank, FSB against Abelardo Montano and Flooring and Kitchen Resources LLC. The plaintiff is a federal savings bank based in Salt Lake City, Utah. The complaint alleges a breach of contract based on a Credit...
Notice of Service
Date: November 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 22, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: October 29, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 29, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: November 05, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: February 15, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: September 14, 2018Motion
Date: May 02, 2018Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: June 11, 2018Motion for Default
Date: August 09, 2019Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: October 29, 2020Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 22, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: September 17, 2020Order Granting Default
Date: August 19, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: September 17, 2020Non-Military Affidavit
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 22, 2021Notice
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVICE OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff American Express National Bank |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing September 2, 2021 at 8:45am via zoom |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Costs Party: Plaintiff American Express National Bank |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff American Express National Bank |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Party: Plaintiff American Express National Bank |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.