Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Learning Systems Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gunion, Melissa A, against Anderson, Denis, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by American Learning Systems, Inc. ("AMERICAN") against Denis Anderson for breach of contract and account stated. AMERICAN is a Florida corporation that provides educational services and facilities to children. Denis Anderson ...
eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: May 31, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 18, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 15, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: September 04, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 23, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 17, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: August 28, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: September 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss and StrikeParty: Defendant Anderson, Denis |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 22nd day of September, 2018Party: Defendant Anderson, Denis |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff American Learning Systems Inc |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MELISSA ANNE GUNION ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A078240; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias DENIS ANDERSON |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO EFFECTUATE SERVICEParty: Plaintiff American Learning Systems Inc |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Anderson, Denis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.