Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Adheen, Trevor T, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Adheen, Doris, represented by Miller, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff is suing the defendant for damages, but the specific amount is not specified in the provided text. The plaintiff resides in Broward County, Florid...
Complaint
Date: January 03, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 27, 2018Motion
Date: March 15, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 27, 20184th DCA Order
Date: April 02, 20184th DCA Order
Date: May 30, 2018Order
Date: May 12, 2018Motion
Date: February 06, 2018Motion
Date: March 28, 2018Acknowledgment
Date: April 02, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: February 27, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: March 19, 2018Motion
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Appeal
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D18-0985 - ORDERED that the April 23, 2018 petition for writ of prohibition is denied. |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ACCEPTING LOW NUMBERED TRANSFER and CONSOLIDATING CASES |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4d18-0985 - The Clerk of the District Court of Appeal, Fourth District, has received for filing a Moion to be Relieved of Costs, an Affidavit of Indigency, and a Certificate of Counsel (if required |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D18-0985 - ORDERED that the Notice of Appeal fiel in th eCircuit Court is Treated as Petition for Wit of Prohibition . Petitioner shal file a petition and appendix in complicance with Florida Ruleof Appeallate Procedure 9.100 within twenty (20) days from the date of this order. |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D18-0985 - The $300.00 filing fee or affidavit of indigency in conformance with sections 57.081 and57.085, Florida Statutes, did not accompany the petition as required in Florida Rule of Appellate Pocedure 9.100(b). The filing fee is due and payable at the time of filing REGARDLESS OF WHETHER THEPETITION IS SUBSEQUENTLY VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED OR ADVERSELY DISMISSED... |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment 4D18-0985 - Petition for Writ of Prohibition |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.