Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alfonso, Camilo, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richison, Robin Ann, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Ronderos, Ian S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Camilo Alfonso against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages under an insurance policy for the loss of property valued at over $15,000. The plaintiff alleges that...
Agreed Order
Date: April 25, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 22, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 23, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 30, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 26, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 24, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change Party: Plaintiff Alfonso, Camilo |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Charging Lien | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Ian S. Ronderos, Esquire Florida Bar No.: 0070462Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.