Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vohs, Ronald, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Chan, Yeemee, against Comcast Corporation, Industrial Cable Communications Services Inc, Josimars Cleaning Services Corp, Usa Br General Services Corp, represented by Mcarthur, Connolly C, Esq., Rubio, Armando P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2017 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Ronald Vohs against Josimar's Cleaning Services Corp., USA BR General Services Corp., Industrial Cable Communications Services Inc., and Comcast Corporation. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants in...
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 05, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 05, 2017Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: August 01, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 26, 2017Summons Returned Served
Date: May 23, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 05, 2017Notice of Service
Date: July 28, 2017Answer to Complaint
Date: June 13, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 27, 2017Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 24, 2017Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: July 28, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: July 28, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 27, 2017eSummons Issuance
Date: April 21, 2017Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: August 17, 2018Privilege Log
Date: July 28, 2017Request for Production
Date: June 13, 2017eSummons Issuance
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 13, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: October 27, 2017Notice
Date: September 10, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: September 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 28, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 28, 2017eSummons Issuance
Date: April 21, 2017Motion
Date: September 13, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: October 27, 2017Request for Copies
Date: October 31, 2017Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 14, 2017Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 20, 2017eSummons Issuance
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 01, 2017Exhibit List
Date: September 21, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 02, 2017Agreed Order
Date: September 13, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 20, 2017Response to Request for Copies
Date: October 31, 2017Request for Production
Date: April 21, 2017Request for Copies
Date: August 02, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 14, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 20, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 22, 2017Request for Production
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 03, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 07, 2017Notice of Filing
Date: November 14, 2017Request for Production
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 10, 2017Summons Returned Served
Date: November 27, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 22, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 22, 2017Request for Production
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 28, 2017Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 10, 2017Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 11, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 22, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 20, 2017Request for Copies
Date: August 14, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 29, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 29, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 04, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 16, 2017Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 16, 2017Answer to Interrogs
Date: August 16, 2017Request for Copies
Date: January 16, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 29, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: April 21, 2017Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 09, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 21, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: July 10, 2017Certificate of No Objection
Date: July 10, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 18, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: February 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 21, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 10, 2017Request for Copies
Date: July 24, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 24, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 12, 2017Request for Copies
Date: July 18, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 14, 2017Order Extending Time
Date: August 20, 2017Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: August 28, 2017Complaint (eFiled)
Date: April 21, 2017Civil Cover Sheet
Date: April 21, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 01, 2017Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 11, 2017Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 21, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 11, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 11, 2017Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 05, 2017Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 11, 2017Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 06, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 11, 2017Request for Production
Date: September 14, 2017Notice of Interrogatories
Date: September 14, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: May 17, 2018Motion for Leave
Date: July 28, 2017Notice of Court Appearance
Date: September 14, 2017Subpoena Returned Served
Date: May 21, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 23, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: May 19, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: September 18, 2017Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Change of Address
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 04, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 21, 2017Amended Witness List
Date: October 17, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 09, 2018Notice
Date: November 05, 2018Mediation Report
Date: December 03, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 28, 2018Stipulation
Date: January 29, 2019Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: November 16, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: November 28, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: November 20, 2018Witness List
Date: September 21, 2018Witness List
Date: October 26, 2018Request for Copies
Date: November 19, 2018Request to Produce
Date: November 20, 2018Request for Copies
Date: October 16, 2018Witness List
Date: September 27, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: October 26, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 28, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 28, 2018Certificate
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 28, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: November 21, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: September 14, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: August 06, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal
Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report
Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Defendant USA BR General Services Corp Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTParty: Defendant USA BR General Services Corp Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Defendant Industrial Cable Communications Services Inc Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment /AMENDEDParty: Defendant USA BR General Services Corp Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Deposition of Elizeu Silva, taken on February 23,2018Party: Defendant Industrial Cable Communications Services Inc Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Deposition of Ronald Vohs, taken on November 7,2017Party: Defendant Industrial Cable Communications Services Inc Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Deposition of Marcel Silva, taken on February 23, 2018Party: Defendant Industrial Cable Communications Services Inc Judge: 05 Bidwill, Martin J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.