Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Desaussure, Erone, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rainer, Jamie L, against Levy, Alison Jan, represented by Capece, Angelina Carmella, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Erone Desaussure against Alison Levy in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $15,000, excluding attorney fees, interest, and costs. The...
Request for Production
Date: October 16, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: October 16, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 18, 2017Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 16, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 16, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 17, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: December 18, 2017Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2016Letter From
Date: March 22, 2017Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2016Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 09, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: January 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 02, 2017Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 24, 2017eSummons Issuance
Date: April 19, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 09, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 24, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 24, 2017Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 11, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 01, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 21, 2017Notice of Service
Date: May 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: July 27, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 16, 2018Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: May 14, 2018Motion for Default
Date: July 27, 2017Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 16, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 20, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: July 28, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 20, 2018Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: June 13, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 13, 2018Notice of Absence from Jurisdiction
Date: July 31, 2017Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 24, 2017Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: June 25, 2018Interrogatories
Date: October 16, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 25, 2017Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: October 25, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: December 06, 2018Order
Date: January 07, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: November 05, 2018Witness List
Date: November 09, 2018Exhibit List
Date: November 09, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: November 09, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 16, 2018Subpoena for Trial
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: June 27, 2018Subpoena for Trial
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: July 18, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 06, 2018Subpoena for Trial
Date: November 01, 2018Order Setting
Date: October 25, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 20, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: July 31, 2017Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order TO MEET AND CONFER Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Defendant Levy, Alison Jan Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Trial SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR WITNESS TO TESTIFY AT TRIAL - Peter Merkle, MD, commencing February 2, 201 at 9:00 am and ending on February 22, 2019 at 5:00 pm Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Trial SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR WITNESS TO TESTIFY AT TRIAL - Elizabeth Trinidad, MD, commencing February , 2019 at 9:00 am and ending on February 22, 2019 at 5:00 pm Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness List
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Expert Witness List
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness & Exhibit List
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.