Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ferguson, James, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Castrataro, George W, Esq., against Mainer, Earl, represented by Bissonnette, Robert Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Response to Request to Produce
Date: July 13, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 29, 2018Agreed Order
Date: November 29, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: April 22, 2019Letter to Judge
Date: July 15, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 28, 2017Agreed Order
Date: April 13, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: September 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 20, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: May 03, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 01, 2017Request for Production
Date: June 05, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: June 05, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 13, 2017Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: June 22, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Comment: (BAD IMAGE SUBMITTED, ATTACHED AND EMAIL FROM J.A.) |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference SEPTEMBER 9,2020 at 9:30 a.m |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge Party: Plaintiff Ferguson, James |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKET AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS - GRANTED IN PART Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Case from Trial Docket and Motion for SanctionsParty: Defendant Mainer, Earl Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure - DISCOVERY ONLY - ORDER GRANTING DF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Mainer, Earl Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline CALENDAR CALL: 06-03-2019 at 10:30 AM - Courtroom 14175 Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order On Case Management Conference Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.