Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gilson, Ali Isenberg, Esq., against Aqua Finance Inc, Brutus, Laurent, Brutus, Rosenie, represented by Cuenant, Winston I, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: May 08, 2016Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 21, 2016Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 26, 2016Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 13, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: March 08, 2016Motion
Date: September 14, 2016Notice of Filing
Date: December 13, 2016Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: May 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Comment: Original Note & Mortgage Document return request completed on 8/25/17 |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: HEATHER J KOCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A062446; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust NA |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO MAKE PRE- CONFIRMATION PLAN PAYMENTS AND FOR FAILURE TO APPER AT THE SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORSParty: Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust NA |
|
November 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Suggestion of Bankruptcy |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy SBA #: 16-24450-JKOParty: Defendant Brutus, Laurent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.