Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mcdonough, Edward Joseph, against Branch Banking & Trust Co, Zingarelli, Donna, represented by Fitzgerald, Elizabeth C, Ivich, Carolina, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA against Donna Zingarelli and other unknown parties. The complaint states that the defendants are in possession of two properties located at 2100 Northeast 45th Street, Units 1 and 2...
Exhibit List
Date: November 15, 2016Response
Date: April 20, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 17, 2017Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 19, 2018Order Disbursing Funds
Date: May 30, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 25, 2017Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 03, 2017Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2015Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 31, 2017Answer
Date: February 01, 2016Agreed Order
Date: March 28, 2016Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 27, 2016Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 05, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 13, 2017Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: December 04, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 08, 2016Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: August 08, 2016Amended Motion
Date: April 19, 2018Motion for Disbursement
Date: April 05, 2018Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 09, 2018Order Disbursing Funds
Date: May 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK $28.94 SURP NOTIFY |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment of Surplus Trustee Palmetto Group 8, LLC |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO SHAPIRO FISHMAN & GACHE LLP PER ORD ($27,371.24) MAILED; BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY ($106,13.52) MAILED; BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK ($15.00) CLERK FEES |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Disbursing Funds | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Disbursing Funds Amended |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.