Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Fort Lauderdale, Weissman, Bradley H., filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Weissman, Bradley H, against Higuera, Barbara, Rodriguez, Yunior, Victores, William, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryForfeiture (Prior To 7/1/16) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida, seeking forfeiture of $27,015.00 U.S. Currency. The complaint alleges that the currency was used or intended to be used in violation of Sections 932.702(1-5), Florida S...
Amended Complaint
Date: July 27, 2016Petition (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2015Order Finding Probable Cause
Date: August 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication SALE SET- 6/27/17 10:00 AM Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Rodriguez, Yunior Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Proof of Publication 10/28/16 To: Yunior Rodriquez on or before 30 days Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy to Daily Business Review
Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action TO: YUNIOR RODRIGUEZ/ ON OR BEFORE 30DAYS OF 1ST PUBL Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Constructive Service of Process YUNIOR RODRIGUEZ Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default defendant, BARBARA HIGUERA Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default defendant, WILLIAM VICTORES Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Rodriguez, Yunior Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.