Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gloria Morgan Plaintiff vs. Leslie Evelyn Defendant
On December 18, 2015 a 3 case was filed by Morgan, Gloria, against Evelyn, Leslie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 RESULTING TRUST
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Action
Date: Apr 19, 2016Motion for Default
Date: Apr 19, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 18, 2016Proof of Publication
Date: Mar 09, 2016Motion for Default Default
Date: Mar 09, 2016Notice of Action
Date: Jan 05, 2016Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: Dec 18, 2015Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 18, 2015Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Dec 18, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action A Cpmolaint has been filed ad commenced in this court and you are required to serv a copy of your wrtten answer and defenses and any to KENNETH S. MAIR, ESQ. attorney for the Plaintiff. , and on or bfore Jan. 31, 2016, Otherwise a DEFAULT will be entered Against you for the relief prayed for in th Complaint. Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULTParty: Plaintiff Morgan, Gloria
Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Tuesday, April 19, 2016 @ 8:45 a.m. Rm 1060 Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication to LESUE EVELYN /on or before 01-31-16 Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Evelyn, Leslie Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action on or before January 31,2016//DBR//Leslie Evelyn Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
No Mail Out
Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy to Daily Business Review
Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: KENNETH S MAIR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A180686; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligent Search Party: Plaintiff Morgan, Gloria Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Morgan, Gloria Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 09 Levenson, Jeffrey R. |