Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kayachanian, Patricia, Valletti, Maximiliano, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Linares, Luisa M, against Kimco Facility Services, Llc, Simon Property Group, Inc., Sunrise Mills, represented by Glusman, Jason Aaron, Glusman, Jason A, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Reply to Answer
Date: February 19, 2016Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: March 07, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 19, 2016Request to Produce
Date: June 13, 2016Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 13, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 18, 2016Answer to Interrogs
Date: February 26, 2016Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 06, 2016Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 06, 2016Request to Produce
Date: January 06, 2016Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 22, 2016Reply to Answer
Date: February 24, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 26, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: February 26, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: March 02, 2016Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: June 13, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: March 02, 2016Motion
Date: March 02, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: June 13, 2016Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: April 26, 2016Request to Produce
Date: June 13, 2016Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: March 07, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: June 13, 2016Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 02, 2016Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 15, 2016Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 24, 2016Order Extending Time
Date: May 31, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 28, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 16, 2016Objection
Date: August 24, 2016Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 26, 2016Order
Date: July 06, 2016Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 26, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 02, 2016Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: September 02, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: October 12, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 18, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: October 20, 2016Request for Production
Date: October 20, 2016Order on Motion to Compel
Date: August 02, 2016Order on Motion to Compel
Date: July 13, 2016Request for Copies
Date: August 03, 2016Request for Copies
Date: August 03, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 18, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: August 05, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 18, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: June 16, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 18, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: August 16, 2016Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 30, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: August 16, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 20, 2017Request for Copies
Date: February 20, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: January 19, 2017Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: June 19, 2017Answer to Interrogs
Date: March 14, 2017Mediation Report
Date: July 31, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: March 20, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 01, 2016Answer to Interrogs
Date: March 20, 2017Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 20, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 13, 2017Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: April 19, 2017Notice of Mediation
Date: May 17, 2017Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 19, 2017Agreed Order
Date: April 11, 2016Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 30, 2016Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Party: Defendant Kimco Facility Services, LLC |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition (amended) of Ricardo Albino Mercardo |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.