Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HOA Fin Services LLC Plaintiff vs. Gema Del Rocio Munoz, et al Defendant
On October 06, 2015 a real prop other - $0 - $50,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 06, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Real Prop Other - $0 - $50,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Summary Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by HOA Financial Services, LLC against GEMA DEL ROCIO MUNOZ, VILLAS DE VENEZIA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, LITTON LOAN SERVICING, and ALL PARTIES CLAIMING BY OR THROUGH SAID DEFENDANTS. The complaint seeks to quiet title to a…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: Oct 18, 2016Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jun 13, 2016Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 27, 2016Motion for Disbursement
Date: Apr 06, 2016Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 14, 2016Answer
Date: Feb 01, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Oct 06, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff HOA Fin Services LLC Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AS CO-COUNSELParty: Plaintiff HOA Fin Services LLC Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Party: Defendant Litton Loan Servicing Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, Litton Loan Servicing, LLC ("Litton Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Adam P. Hartley, Esq. / FBN: 52211 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Adam P. Hartley, Esq. Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 05/03/2016 @ 9:15 A.M./RM 718 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disbursement Party: Defendant Litton Loan Servicing Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Del Rocio Munoz, Gema Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/17/16Party: Defendant Del Rocio Munoz, Gema Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLEParty: Defendant Litton Loan Servicing Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Litton Loan Servicing Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service of Process Party: Defendant Litton Loan Servicing Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KYLE LEIGH SCHMITT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A019337; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance GEMA DEL RICO MUNOZ Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01-28-16Party: Defendant Villas De Venezia Condo Assn Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non Appearance Party: Defendant Villas De Venezia Condo Assn Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer TO COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLEParty: Defendant Villas De Venezia Condo Assn Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Villas De Venezia Condo Assn Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KYLE SCHMITT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A004970; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KYLE SCHMITT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A004421; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Villas De Venezia Condo Assn Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Litton Loan Servicing Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: KYLE SCHMITT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A145965; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) to Quiet TitleParty: Plaintiff HOA Fin Services LLC Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
No Summons Issued
Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |