Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America Na, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bush, Brian, against Emerald Springs Homes Of Davie Homeowners Assn Inc, Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, Selem-Vallejo, Lourdes, Vallejo, Jorge A, Vallejo, Jorge M, (total of 5) See All represented by Arcia, Omar J, Esq., Ruocco, Ralph C, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Answer
Date: September 02, 2015Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: March 07, 2016Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 27, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 23, 2015Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: January 25, 2016Response to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 27, 2016Mediator's
Date: June 02, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 27, 2016Notice of Filing
Date: June 08, 2016Order
Date: May 04, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 30, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 11, 2015Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 21, 2015Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 11, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 02, 2016Motion for Mediation
Date: April 15, 2016Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: April 26, 2016Order
Date: April 26, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: January 25, 2016Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 14, 2015Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: April 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation Of hearing. June 14, 2016, at 8:45 a.m. Rm 519 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Copy of Mediator's Report Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mediator's
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing rm 519 June 14, 2016, at 8:45 a.m Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED MEDIATION Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED MEDIATION AND PLAINTIFF'S ORDER GRANTING MOTION FORSUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PLAINTIFFParty: Plaintiff U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Affirmative Defenses TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Plaintiff Bank of America NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.